OR HB4153 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 44, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Chapter 44, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a task force to look for and find words and meanings related to artificial intelligence that may be used in laws. Makes task force report its findings on or before December 1, 2024. (Flesch Readability Score: 60.1). Establishes the Task Force on Artificial Intelligence. Requires the task force to examine and identify terms and definitions related to artificial intelligence that may be used for legislation and report its findings and recommendations to the interim committee of the Legislative Assembly related to information management and technology on or before December 1, 2024. Sunsets the task force January 1, 2025. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to artificial intelligence; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Chapter 44, (2024 Laws): Effective date March 27, 2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-03-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Woods. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 3--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nguyen D. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 2--Boshart Davis, Cramer; Excused for Business of the House, 6--Bowman, Dexter, Javadi, Sanchez, Scharf, Speaker Rayfield. |
2024-03-04 | House | Second reading. |
2024-03-01 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2024-03-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-28 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2024-02-28 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-27 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Information Management and Technology with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |