OR HB4131 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6)
Status: Failed on March 7 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
The Act funds matching deposits for IDA accounts. (Flesch Readability Score: 61.2). Appropriates moneys from the General Fund to the Housing and Community Services Department for the purpose of making matching deposits into individual development accounts. Declares an emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to individual development accounts; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Rep. Annessa Hartman [D] |
Rep. Cyrus Javadi [R] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Sen. Mark Meek [D] |
Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] | Rep. Tom Andersen [D] | Rep. Ben Bowman [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] |
Rep. Lucetta Elmer [R] | Rep. Mark Gamba [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. James Hieb [R] |
Rep. Zach Hudson [D] | Rep. Emerson Levy [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Rep. Travis Nelson [D] | Rep. Daniel Nguyen [D] | Rep. Hoa Nguyen [D] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Rep. Hai Pham [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Lisa Reynolds [D] | Rep. Anna Scharf [R] |
Rep. Jules Walters [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] |
Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2024-02-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2024-02-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2024-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Human Services with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2024-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |