OR HB4110 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-04 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Task Force on Victim Access to Police Records. Establishes procedures by which certain crime or abuse victims and other authorized persons may request and receive copies of law enforcement agency records concerning case.] Establishes Task Force on Victim Access to Police Records. Directs task force to develop recommendations for legislation to ensure victims of crime, abuse, neglect or other potentially criminal conduct can access from law enforcement entities records related to crime, abuse, neglect or potentially criminal conduct perpetrated against them. Requires task force to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to law enforcement no later than November 1, 2022. Sunsets task force on June 30, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to victim access to records; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Anna Williams [D] | Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] |
Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Jason Kropf [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] |
Sen. James Manning [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2022-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |