OR HB4104 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 9, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter 9, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements for health benefit plan coverage of hearing loss treatments.
Title
Relating to hearing loss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Chapter 9, (2018 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2019. |
2018-03-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2018-02-28 | Senate | President signed. |
2018-02-28 | House | Speaker signed. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by DeBoer. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Girod, Kruse. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2018-02-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Malstrom, Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Lively. |
2018-02-14 | House | Second reading. |
2018-02-13 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2018-02-12 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2018-02-05 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2018-01-22 | House | Presession Released to the Public. |