OR HB3649 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 71, (2010 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 18 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-18 - Chapter 71, (2010 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to electricity from low-impact hydroelectric facilities that may be used to comply with renewable portfolio standards.
Title
Relating to electricity from low-impact hydroelectric facilities that may be used to comply with renewable portfolio standards.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | Chapter 71, (2010 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2011. | |
2010-03-18 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-24 | President signed. | |
2010-02-24 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-20 | Dingfelder declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2010-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Schrader. Passed. Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-19 | Carried over to 02-20 by unanimous consent. | |
2010-02-18 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Business and Transportation. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-12 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Bentz, Clem, Smith G. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading. Carried by VanOrman. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Berger. | |
2010-02-11 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-02 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Agriculture, Natural Resources and Rural Communities. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |