OR HB3617 | 2010 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 41, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-10 - Chapter 41, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to local government provision of services; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to local government provision of services; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | Chapter 41, (2010 Laws): Effective date March 10, 2010. | |
2010-03-10 | Governor signed. | |
2010-02-25 | President signed. | |
2010-02-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2010-02-23 | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Kahl, Schaufler. | |
2010-02-20 | Third reading. Carried by Bonamici. Passed. Ayes, 28; nays, 1--Kruse; excused, 1--Nelson. | |
2010-02-19 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-18 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2010-02-17 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2010-02-15 | Referred to Education and General Government. | |
2010-02-15 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2010-02-12 | Third reading. Carried by Tomei. Passed. Ayes, 60. | |
2010-02-11 | Second reading. | |
2010-02-10 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2010-02-09 | Work Session held. | |
2010-02-04 | Public Hearing held. | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to Agriculture, Natural Resources and Rural Communities. | |
2010-02-01 | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |