OR HB3486 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires manufacturer of prescription drug with annual wholesale acquisition cost of $10,000 or more, or with wholesale acquisition cost of $10,000 or more per course of treatment, to file annual report with Oregon Health Authority on costs associated with prescription drug for previous calendar year.
Title
Relating to prescription drugs.
Sponsors
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2015-03-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3486 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3486/Introduced |