OR HB3478 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts claims based on conduct that constitutes child abuse, or conduct that constitutes knowingly allowing, permitting or encouraging child abuse, from notice requirement of Oregon Tort Claims Act.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Tort Claims Act; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Vicki Berger [R] | Rep. Jason Conger [R] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] |
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Bruce Starr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-04-26 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |