OR HB3478 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to benefit plans provided to certain educational employees.
Title
Relating to benefit plans provided to certain educational employees.
Sponsors
Rep. Katerina Brewer [R] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] | Rep. Julie Parrish [R] | Rep. Patrick Sheehan [R] |
Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Health Care. | |
2011-02-21 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.or.us/searchmeas.html |
Text | http://www.leg.state.or.us/11reg/measures/hb3400.dir/hb3478.intro.html |