OR HB3470 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 725, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 725, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Legislative Counsel and Legislative Fiscal Officer to review state law governing investment by State Treasurer of moneys of state and of local and tribal governments. Permits Oregon Liquor Control Commission to make expenditures related to marijuana regulation from Oregon Liquor Control Commission Account. Requires commission to repay amounts expended plus amount for interest. Modifies operative date of law related to funding of science, technology, engineering and mathematics education. Modifies repeal of law related to appearance of Department of Human Services at certain court proceedings. Modifies operative and repeal dates of laws relating to certain state aid programs. Transfers housing of Oregon Volunteers Commission for Voluntary Action and Service to Office of Governor from Housing and Community Services Department. Requires Department of Transportation to transfer certain moneys to Oregon Business Development Department for grant to advance manufacturing technologies. Modifies applicability date of law relating to legislator salaries. Permits county to use certain moneys to provide conciliation and mediation services in circuit courts. Provides that certain expenditures from Water Supply Development Account are not subject to application process or public benefit scoring. Transfers moneys from specified funds and accounts to General Fund for general governmental purposes. Directs distribution of revenue from tax on marijuana items. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 725, (2017 Laws): Effective date August 15, 2017. |
2017-08-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Thatcher declared potential conflict of interest. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Devlin. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nathanson. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Parrish; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to July 6, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-07-03 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-07-03 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-07-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-18 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2017-06-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-06-13 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |