OR HB3452 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 626, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 626, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Describes circumstances in which wolves may be taken.
Title
Relating to wolves; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | House | Chapter 626, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder,Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Carried over to 06-27 by unanimous consent. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-18 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2013-06-10 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-06 | House | Third reading. Carried by Jenson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Gallegos, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2013-06-05 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-05-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules. |
2013-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-03-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |