OR HB3451 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands recipients eligible for subsidized employment-related child care to include persons looking for work. Provides that maximum three months' subsidy may include persons participating in job training programs in Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. Directs Department of Human Services to establish and implement practices and procedures to connect unemployed persons who are eligible for employment-related child care subsidies to job training programs in the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program.
Title
Relating to child care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Early Childhood and Family Supports. |
2017-04-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/HB3451 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3451/Introduced |