OR HB3398 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 639, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 639, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Delays implementation requirements for paid family and medical leave program. Delays implementation requirements for paid family and medical leave program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to family medical leave benefits; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 639, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-27 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 34; Nays, 21--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Evans, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 21; Nays, 7--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Patterson, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-08 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 33; Nays, 19--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wilde, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 7--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Holvey, Power, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-05-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |