OR HB3388 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes reserve officers sponsored by law enforcement unit to pay for training as police with cash and G.I. Bill education benefits. Requires Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to increase training class sizes by up to 25 percent as necessary to train sponsored reserve officers. Requires reserve officer to remain with law enforcement unit for at least three years after certification and allows Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to suspend or revoke certification if reserve officer fails to comply without good cause. Requires Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to conduct study of impact of measure on state and local public safety budgets and recruitment and maintenance of public safety and to submit report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to public safety.
Title
Relating to the training of police officers.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-14 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |