OR HB3382 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-08 - Vote explanation(s) filed by Wright.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Allows local government to adopt land use exception to Goal 16 under certain conditions for applications for deep draft navigation channel improvements in Oregon International Port of Coos Bay. Allows local government to adopt land use exception to Goal 16 under certain conditions for applications for deep draft navigation channel improvements in Oregon International Port of Coos Bay. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ports; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-08HouseVote explanation(s) filed by Wright.
2023-06-08HouseThird reading. Carried by Gomberg. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 3--Chaichi, Gamba, Pham K; Excused, 3--Levy B, Morgan, Owens; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Sanchez.
2023-06-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 8, 2023 Calendar.
2023-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2023-06-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2023-06-01HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2023-05-23HouseReferred to Rules by order of Speaker.
2023-05-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Rules.
2023-05-18HouseWork Session held.
2023-05-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-05-11HouseWork Session held.
2023-03-14HousePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-03HouseReferred to Transportation.
2023-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/HB3382
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3382/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3382/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3382/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3382/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3382/B-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24950
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24996
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25040
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25062
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/25192
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/74646
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/265081
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/264797
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/273663
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274018
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274194
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274213
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274238
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274331
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274332
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274335
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79921
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79922
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79924
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/274402
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/79985
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275227
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80138
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80144
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80150
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/275439
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/80220
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35903
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35973
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=585207

Bill Comments

feedback