OR HB3364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates credit against income taxes for purchasing publicly supported housing to retain as affordable housing. Creates credit against income taxes for purchasing publicly supported housing to retain as affordable housing. Applies to sales of housing completed in tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, and before January 1, 2028.
Title
Relating to tax credits for the preservation of publicly supported housing; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] | Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Tax Expenditures (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker. |
2021-05-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures. |
2021-05-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2021-03-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |