OR HB3361 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 187, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 187, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that third-party food platform may not take and arrange for delivery of order from food place without written consent of food place. Requires third-party food platform to enter into agreement with food place before arranging delivery of orders from food place or listing food place on application or website.] Provides that third-party food platform may not take and arrange for delivery of order from food place without written consent of food place.
Title
Relating to food delivery.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Sen. Daniel Bonham [R] | Sen. Katherine Lieber [D] |
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Paul Holvey [D] | Sen. Janeen Sollman [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 187, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Thatcher. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Drazan, Levy. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-03-31 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-03-08 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |