OR HB3361 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 720, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-18 - Chapter 720, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Chief Information Officer to appoint Chief Data Officer to maintain web portal for publication of data of state agencies. Directs Chief Data Officer to establish open data standard and publish technical standards manual for state agencies publishing data on portal. Requires state agencies to comply with open data standard and technical standards manual and publish data on web portal on and after May 1, 2019. Directs Secretary of State and State Treasurer to adopt by rule requirements related to data that are same as or similar to requirements established by State Chief Information Officer or Chief Data Officer.
Title
Relating to open data standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-07-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-18 | House | Chapter 720, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-15 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-07-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-07-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-07-05 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nearman. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2017-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-05 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-05-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2017-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-13 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |