OR HB3352 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to prepare and make available statement that discloses potential health risks of wireless network technology. Requires department to adopt by rule guidelines for including in school curricula, assemblies, open houses, meetings between parents and teachers and related settings information concerning hazards of exposure to microwave radiation and radio frequency radiation and how to safely use wireless devices. Requires department and Oregon Health Authority to conduct study on effects of exposure to microwave radiation and radio frequency radiation, particularly exposure that results from use of wireless network technologies, on development and health of students in schools of this state, to develop recommendations to schools in this state for practices and alternative technologies that would reduce students' exposure to harmful microwave radiation and radio frequency radiation and report results of study and recommendations to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education not later than September 15, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to exposure to radiation in schools in this state; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Rep. Mitch Greenlick [D] | Rep. Diego Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3352 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3352/Introduced |