OR HB3335 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 553, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 553, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to grant moneys to nonprofit organization for ADU community pilot programs that develop accessory dwelling units for income-eligible homeowners and that are available for lease by income-eligible tenants. Authorizes Housing and Community Services Department to grant moneys to nonprofit organization for ADU community pilot programs that develop accessory dwelling units for income-eligible homeowners and that are available for lease by income-eligible tenants. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Requires department to report on ADU community pilot programs to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2023. Appropriates moneys to department for grant to be awarded to Hacienda Community Development Corporation. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to housing; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Meek [D] | Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] |
Rep. Gary Leif [R] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] |
Rep. Joseph Zika [R] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Kayse Jama [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 553, (2021 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Burdick, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Meek. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 1--Prusak. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-15 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Transportation and Economic Development. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to Housing with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |