OR HB3264 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 216, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 216, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to conduct pilot program on prompt payment of certain contracts. Directs Department of Transportation to conduct pilot program on prompt payment of certain contracts. Directs department to pay small business for certain services within 15 days of receipt of invoice or due date for payment, whichever is later. Requires small business to certify eligibility for prompt payment. Requires department to pay interest on payments that are not made promptly. Creates crime of knowingly supplying false information in connection with certification as small business. Punishes by maximum of one year's imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both. Directs department to report to Legislative Assembly on results of pilot program. Sunsets January 2, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to prompt payment by contracting agencies; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Sen. Dallas Heard [R] | Sen. James Manning [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 216, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 26; excused, 4--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Winters. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Carried over to 05-24 by unanimous consent. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Bynum. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |