OR HB3255 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 261, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 261, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs education employer to provide materials and assistance to eligible employees concerning public service loan forgiveness program. Directs education employer to provide materials and assistance to eligible employees concerning public service loan forgiveness program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to providing information to employees about the public service loan forgiveness program; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Wlnsvey Campos [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] | Rep. Ricki Ruiz [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] |
Rep. Dacia Grayber [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] | Rep. Tawna Sanchez [D] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 261, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 2--Girod, Heard; Excused, 8--Boquist, Findley, Frederick, Hansell, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Campos. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 6--Levy, Lively, Morgan, Nearman, Reynolds, Wallan; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Boshart Davis, Nosse. |
2021-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 16, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-14 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |