OR HB3254 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Environmental Quality to notify local government of attainment area if department determines that attainment area is projected to exceed air quality standards within next five years. Requires department to adopt procedures for notification by rule.
Title
Relating to air quality standards.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | House | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2015-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3254 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3254/Introduced |