OR HB3245 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 432, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-13 - Chapter 432, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits city to authorize planning commission or hearings officer to conduct hearings and make final decisions on applications for amendments to city comprehensive plan map. Permits city to authorize planning commission or hearings officer to conduct hearings and make final decisions on applications for amendments to city comprehensive plan map. Permits person who appeared or participated in proceedings orally or in writing to appeal or petition for review of final decision to city governing body.
Title
Relating to applications for amendments to a city comprehensive plan.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Rep. Jodi Hack [R] | Sen. Jackie Winters [R] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] |
Rep. Janelle Bynum [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] | Rep. Armand Vial [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-12 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-13 | House | Chapter 432, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 51; Nays, 2--Power, Smith Warner; Excused, 7--Bentz, Boone, Helm, McLane, Noble, Smith G, Witt. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Monnes Anderson. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2017-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 47; Nays, 12--Barnhart, Greenlick, Helm, Holvey, Keny-Guyer, McLain, Nathanson, Power, Rayfield, Reardon, Smith Warner, Sollman; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 2, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 1, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 27, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 26, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2017-04-18 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2017-03-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |