OR HB3244 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Increases maximum amount of tax credits for certified film production development contributions that may be certified for fiscal year for all taxpayers. Increases maximum amount of tax credits for certified film production development contributions that may be certified for fiscal year for all taxpayers. Applies to fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to tax credits for certified film production development contributions; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do pass. Refer to Tax Expenditures (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26HouseIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-06-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-11HouseReferred to Tax Expenditures by order of Speaker.
2021-05-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Tax Expenditures.
2021-05-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-22HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-22HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-26HouseReferred to Revenue.
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback