OR HB3234 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 624, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-19 - Chapter 624, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Early Learning Division in Department of Education.
Title
Relating to children; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-19 | House | Chapter 624, (2013 Laws): Effective date July 19, 2013. |
2013-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed. Ayes, 24; nays, 6--Boquist, Close, Ferrioli, Girod, Kruse, Whitsett. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2013-06-27 | House | Third reading. Carried by Komp. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 4--Hicks, Thatcher, Weidner, Whitsett; Excused, 1--Smith. |
2013-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2013-06-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2013-06-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-06-12 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2013-06-12 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2013-04-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2013-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-03-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to Education. |
2013-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |