OR HB3219 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-15 - Third reading. Carried by Morgan, Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Levy.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amends definition of "manufactured dwelling park" to include parks with certain prefabricated structures. Amends definition of "manufactured dwelling park" to include parks with certain prefabricated structures. Requires local governments to approve reconstruction of manufactured dwelling parks after wildfire] natural disasters. Authorizes local governments to rezone areas for manufactured dwelling parks where wildfires have creating housing scarcity.] Allows Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to exempt those manufactured dwelling parks from certain building codes. Sunsets January 2, 2026.] Establishes respective rights for landlords and tenants of manufactured dwelling parks following natural disaster. Allows landlords to require park tenants to maintain liability insurance. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to manufactured dwelling parks; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-15HouseThird reading. Carried by Morgan, Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Levy.
2021-04-14HouseCarried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-13HouseCarried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-10HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-08HouseCarried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-04-07HouseRules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar.
2021-04-06HouseSecond reading.
2021-04-02HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-03-29HouseWork Session held.
2021-03-15HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-26HouseReferred to Wildfire Recovery.
2021-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback