OR HB3175 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 214, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 214, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to definition of "low income households" in Local Innovation and Fast Track Housing Program. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Local Innovation and Fast Track Housing Program; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. David Gomberg [D] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Carla Piluso [D] |
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 214, (2017 Laws): Effective date June 6, 2017. |
2017-06-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Olsen, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Human Services. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gomberg, Whisnant. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Piluso. |
2017-04-06 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |