OR HB3165 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Work Session held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide planning grants to 10 school districts or education service districts to evaluate community needs for school-based health services. Requires authority to provide operating funds to at least six school-based health center medical sponsors to open state-certified school-based health centers in grantee school districts or education service districts. Requires] Permits authority to provide $35,000 per year] operating funds to up to four school districts or education service districts to implement five-year pilot projects testing approaches to providing school-based health services as alternatives to school-based health centers. Establishes minimum grant amount for each certified school-based health center.] Directs authority to work with federal agency and stakeholders to secure increased federal funding for school-based health centers. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to school-based health services; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14HouseWork Session held.
2019-06-10HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2019-06-10HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2019-06-05HouseWork Session cancelled.
2019-05-28HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-09HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2019-04-02HouseWork Session held.
2019-03-26HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-19HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-03-06HouseReferred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2019-02-28HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback