OR HB3160 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires publicly traded corporation that makes political expenditure of more than $100 in calendar year to first obtain approval for political expenditure from shareholders by affirmative vote of majority of shares entitled to vote. Requires corporation to disclose amount, recipient and purpose of each political expenditure in excess of $100 in each calendar year. Requires directors of publicly traded corporation to disclose statement of economic interest that provides certain information with respect to director's or officer's interest in recipient of political expenditure or in candidate or expected change in policy for which publicly traded corporation made political expenditure. Becomes operative on January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to political expenditures by publicly traded corporations; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-02-28 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3160 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3160/Introduced |