OR HB3159 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 549, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 549, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires coordinated care organization, health care provider or health insurer to collect from patient, client or member data on race, ethnicity, preferred spoken and written languages, disability status, sexual orientation and gender identity. Requires coordinated care organization, health care provider or health insurer to collect from patient, client or member data on race, ethnicity, preferred spoken and written languages, disability status, sexual orientation and gender identity. Establishes civil penalty for violation. Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish data system for receipt and storage of specified data. Requires authority to report every two years, beginning on June 1, 2022, on collection of data to appropriate interim committees of Legislative Assembly. Directs authority to administer grant program to provide funding to support safe data collection by specified organizations. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to data collection; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 549, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-12 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |