OR HB3159 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Chapter 549, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires coordinated care organization, health care provider or health insurer to collect from patient, client or member data on race, ethnicity, preferred spoken and written languages, disability status, sexual orientation and gender identity. Requires coordinated care organization, health care provider or health insurer to collect from patient, client or member data on race, ethnicity, preferred spoken and written languages, disability status, sexual orientation and gender identity. Establishes civil penalty for violation. Requires Oregon Health Authority to establish data system for receipt and storage of specified data. Requires authority to report every two years, beginning on June 1, 2022, on collection of data to appropriate interim committees of Legislative Assembly. Directs authority to administer grant program to provide funding to support safe data collection by specified organizations. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to data collection; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 14 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-30HouseChapter 549, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
2021-07-19HouseGovernor signed.
2021-06-30SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-29HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-26SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Johnson, Kennemer, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr.
2021-06-26SenateSecond reading.
2021-06-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill.
2021-06-25SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2021-06-25SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2021-06-24HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 40; Nays, 18--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 1--Smith G.
2021-06-24HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-23HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2021-06-21HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-16HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2021-06-16HouseWork Session held.
2021-06-13HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Human Services.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker.
2021-04-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means.
2021-04-13HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-08HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-06HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-12HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-02-09HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB3159
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3159/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3159/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3159/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3159/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3159/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3159/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32086
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/33120
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=533722
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=534757

Bill Comments 750

feedback