OR HB3125 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 465, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 465, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Transportation to create emergency contact information form and make form available for individuals to voluntarily provide emergency contact information for inclusion in individual's motor vehicle record for police officers to use, during or after emergency situations, to contact those listed. Directs Department of Transportation to create emergency contact information form and make form available for individuals to voluntarily provide emergency contact information for inclusion in individual's motor vehicle record for police officers to use, during or after emergency situations, to contact those listed. Directs department to conduct outreach program to educate applicants and general public about opportunity to include emergency contact information in motor vehicle record. Sunsets outreach program January 2, 2025.
Title
Relating to documents issued by the Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 465, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-07-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Moore-Green, Nearman. |
2021-06-09 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2021-06-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2021-05-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-22 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2021-02-16 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-02-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |