OR HB3111 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions for reimbursement to administrator of electric vehicle rebates issued to recipients that sell vehicle or terminate lease before 24 months after purchase or beginning of lease. Authorizes charge ahead rebates to be issued for plug-in hybrid electric vehicles. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to vehicle rebates; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-06 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB3111 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3111/Introduced |