OR HB3099 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Chapter 807, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transfers certain duties, functions and powers related to enterprise information technology and telecommunications from Oregon Department of Administrative Services to State Chief Information Officer. Provides that State Chief Information Officer is primary information technology and telecommunications advisor to Governor and specifies duties, functions and powers of officer. Becomes operative January 1, 2016. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to state information technology; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-08-17HouseChapter 807, (2015 Laws): Effective date August 12, 2015.
2015-08-12HouseGovernor signed.
2015-07-13SenatePresident signed.
2015-07-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2015-07-03HouseRules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek.
2015-07-02SenateRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen.
2015-07-02SenateSecond reading.
2015-07-02SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments to the B-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed C-Eng.)
2015-07-01SenateWork Session held.
2015-06-29SenateReferred to Ways and Means.
2015-06-29SenateFirst reading. Referred to President's desk.
2015-06-26HouseRules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Holvey. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner.
2015-06-26HouseSecond reading.
2015-06-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed.
2015-06-23HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-18HouseReturned to Full Committee.
2015-06-18HouseWork Session held.
2015-06-17HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2015-06-16HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-06-11HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Information Technology.
2015-06-03HouseWork Session held.
2015-05-28HousePublic Hearing and Work Session cancelled.
2015-05-26HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On General Government.
2015-05-21HousePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2015-05-07HouseAssigned to Subcommittee On Information Technology.
2015-04-21HouseReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-04-21HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2015-04-16HouseWork Session held.
2015-04-07HousePublic Hearing held.
2015-03-02HouseReferred to Consumer Protection and Government Effectiveness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means.
2015-02-23HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB3099
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/House%20Amendments
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/House%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20B-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/C-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB3099/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/21714
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23154
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=362477
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/23357
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364340
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2015R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=364582

Bill Comments

feedback