OR HB3073 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 528, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-15 - Chapter 528, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Secretary of State to establish provision to be included in each nominating petition or declaration of candidacy that allows candidate to check box indicating that candidate does not want candidate's residence address to be publicly disclosed except in response to written public records request. Requires Secretary of State to establish provision to be included in each nominating petition or declaration of candidacy that allows candidate to check box indicating that candidate does not want candidate's residence address to be publicly disclosed except in response to written public records request. Requires Secretary of State to establish method to allow public office holder to indicate desire not to have public office holder's residence address be publicly disclosed except in response to written public records request. Prohibits Secretary of State and county clerks from disclosing as public record, except in response to written public records request, or including on lists of electors, residence address of candidate or public office holder who indicated desire to limit public accessibility of residence address elector who is candidate for elected office or holder of elected office]. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to public disclosure of voter records; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jami Cate [R] | Rep. Bobby Levy [R] | Rep. James Hieb [R] | Rep. Werner Reschke [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-15 | House | Chapter 528, (2023 Laws): Effective date September 24, 2023. |
2023-07-31 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Manning Jr, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 24; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Carried over to 06-23 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Carried over to 06-22 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-05-31 | House | Third reading. Carried by Cate. Passed. Ayes, 55; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Hieb, Osborne, Wallan. |
2023-05-30 | House | Carried over to May 31, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-05-26 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-05-25 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2023-05-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2023-01-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |