OR HB3067 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 599, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 599, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for cities and counties to certify annually that city or county has not adopted ordinance prohibiting establishment requiring marijuana-related business license and is therefore eligible for distribution of Oregon Marijuana Account moneys. Requires certification with Oregon Department of Administrative Services. Directs Department of Revenue to collect moneys from city or county subject to order to return moneys from ineligible transfer. Applies to transfers of moneys in calendar quarters beginning on or after January 1, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to distribution of marijuana tax revenues to local governments; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Pam Marsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, refer to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Committee Without recommendation as to passage, refer to Revenue by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 599, (2019 Laws): Effective date September 29, 2019. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-06-18 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Rayfield. |
2019-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 17, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-12 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-11 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-06-10 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-14 | House | Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-03-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Economic Development with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2019-02-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |