OR HB3011 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 678, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 678, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends Veteran Educational Bridge Grant Program. Extends Veteran Educational Bridge Grant Program. Modifies time period for certain study conducted by Legislative Fiscal Officer. Transfers uncommitted balance of certain lottery allocation to related fund. Modifies authorized purposes for expenditures from Public Defense Services Account. Increases number of circuit court judges. Repeals law limiting expenditures by Department of Education from moneys transferred from Education Stability Fund to State School Fund. Authorizes expenditure from State School Fund for administration of statewide facilities assessment program. Authorizes retention of moneys in Fund for Student Success for reserve purposes. Authorizes expenditure from Early Learning Account for certain purposes related to early learning facilities. Authorizes expenditures from Wage Security Fund for investigations of unlawful discrimination. Directs Department of Justice to submit biennial report to chairpersons of Joint Committee on Ways and Means on litigation involving state. Modifies authorized purposes for expenditures from Housing Acquisition Fund. Establishes requirements for certain contracts for certain capital construction projects financed with federal American Rescue Plan Act moneys. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to state financial administration; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 678, (2021 Laws): Effective date August 06, 2021. |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 53; Nays, 2--Cate, Post; Excused, 4--Hayden, Moore-Green, Morgan, Smith G. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Johnson. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 3--Hansell, Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill to resolve conflicts. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. referred to Rules by order of the President. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Rayfield. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Hayden, Morgan, Smith G, Weber. |
2021-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-19 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |