OR HB2999 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 413, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Chapter 413, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that temporary duplicate disabled person parking permit may be renewed by mail. Directs Department of Transportation to issue up to two individual disability parking placards or decals upon request.] Provides that temporary duplicate permit is valid for 120 days. Becomes operative on July 6, 2020.
Title
Relating to disability parking permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | House | Chapter 413, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 27; Excused, 2--Hansell, Johnson. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Carried over to 06-06 by unanimous consent. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-05-28 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-02-25 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-02-19 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |