OR HB2997 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 139, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-21 - Chapter 139, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for distribution of amounts collected upon conviction for violation of compulsory attendance laws.
Title
Relating to fines for violation of compulsory attendance laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-21 | House | Chapter 139, (2017 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2018. |
2017-05-24 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-05-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Kruse. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 11--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Manning Jr, Olsen, Riley, Steiner Hayward, Thatcher, Thomsen, Winters. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-04-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith G. Passed.Ayes, 58; Excused, 2--Boone, Lewis. |
2017-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-04-10 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-07 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-29 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Education. |
2017-02-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |