OR HB2934 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that public safety officer who represents that person is acting as employee or agent of public body is acting in scope of employment for purposes of Oregon Tort Claims Act. Provides that public safety officer who represents that person is acting as employee or agent of public body is acting in scope of employment for purposes of Oregon Tort Claims Act. Increases damages limitations under Oregon Tort Claims Act for claims for acts or omissions of public safety officers. Provides for award of attorney fees. Provides that person may bring civil action for damages incurred as result of police officer's failure to report or intervene in misconduct. Expands statewide online database maintained by Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to include settlements of claims against police officers involving misconduct. Requires department to investigate settlements to determine if discipline is warranted.
Title
Relating to public safety.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-29 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Civil Law. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2934 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2934/Introduced |