OR HB2910 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 596, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-4)
Status: Passed on August 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-01 - Chapter 596, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that for person who completes prior educational requirements to participate in Oregon Promise program while confined in correctional facility, six-month period to enroll in courses to participate in program begins after person is first released from correctional facility. Authorizes Higher Education Coordinating Commission to waive requirement that person enrolled in program must enroll in sufficient number of credit hours to be considered at least half-time student, under specified circumstances.
Title
Relating to the Oregon Promise program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-01 | House | Chapter 596, (2019 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-07-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-20 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Doherty, Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLane. |
2019-06-20 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-19 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-06 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2019-06-06 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-28 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2019-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-02-07 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |