OR HB2890 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits Oregon Business Development Department to hire attorney for purpose of prosecuting patent for any invention that faculty, staff or students reduce to practice while employed by or enrolled in public high school in this state. Permits department to assume, assign, partake in or disclaim ownership of any patent that results from invention under terms of contract or other agreement into which department enters with faculty or staff, with students who have legal capacity to enter into contracts or with legal guardians of students without legal capacity to enter into contracts and in accordance with rules department adopts and other applicable law.
Title
Relating to patents for inventions in public high schools in this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-20 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Economic Development. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2890 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2890/Introduced |