OR HB2889 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 326, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-26 - Chapter 326, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Amends Oregon Housing Needs Analysis and land use requirements for local governments related to urbanization. Establishes Oregon Housing Needs Analysis within Housing and Community Services Department. Establishes timeline by which department must adopt rules and implement analysis components.] Amends Oregon Housing Needs Analysis and land use requirements for local governments related to urbanization , including requiring Metro to adopt housing coordination strategy and allowing cities outside of Metro to adopt rural reserves. Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to adopt or amend implementing rules by January 1, 2026]. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to housing development; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-26 | House | Chapter 326, (2023 Laws): Effective date July 18, 2023. |
2023-07-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-06-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Smith DB. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Campos, absent, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Anderson. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 1--Bonham; Absent, 6--Boquist, Hansell, Hayden, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Carried over to 06-21 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Carried over to 06-20 by unanimous consent. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2023-04-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Dexter. Passed. Ayes, 39; Nays, 3--Cate, Diehl, Stout; Excused, 17--Boshart Davis, Elmer, Goodwin, Helfrich, Hieb, Javadi, Levy B, McIntire, Nathanson, Osborne, Owens, Pham H, Reschke, Reynolds, Sosa, Wallan, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Fahey. |
2023-04-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 14, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-04-11 | House | Second reading. |
2023-04-10 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2023-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2023-04-04 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-02-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-07 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-16 | House | Referred to Housing and Homelessness with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |