OR HB2889 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates Guaranteed Opportunity Program. Requires Office of Student Access and Completion to administer program. Requires State Workforce and Talent Development Board to monitor program every two years and make recommendations to Legislative Assembly on whether modifications are necessary to enhance state's workforce needs. Establishes that program becomes operative on January 1, 2039. Establishes Guaranteed Opportunity Program Implementation Fund. Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission, on effective date of Act, to begin process of developing policy and rules necessary to implement Guaranteed Opportunity Program. Requires commission to submit report regarding progress on development of policy and rules to committees relating to public finance and higher education during 2020 and 2021 regular sessions of Legislative Assembly. Establishes Task Force on Implementing Guaranteed Opportunity Program. Requires task force to determine amount of money program will need to raise through bonding, determine which current grant and scholarship programs should be repealed on operative date of Guaranteed Opportunity Program and analyze methods for preventing bad faith participation of individuals in program. Sunsets task force on December 31, 2020. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to methods of paying for post-secondary education; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Education with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/HB2889 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2889/Introduced |