OR HB2889 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chapter 471, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-24 - Chapter 471, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Department of Human Services to ensure child 12 years of age or older in custody of department for at least six consecutive months is entitled to assistance to establish savings account at financial institution. Requires Department of Human Services, child-caring agency and foster home to ensure child receiving care or services from department, agency or home for at least six consecutive months is entitled to establish savings account in child's name for child's sole use and benefit upon child reaching 12 years of age.] Authorizes child to contract with financial institution to establish savings account. Provides that consent of parent, guardian, foster parent or person with legal custody of child is not necessary for child to establish savings account and that parent, guardian, foster parent or person with legal custody of child is not entitled to be account holder or to have access to child's account without child's written authorization with certain exceptions]. Limits liability of financial institution that establishes savings account. Entitles department to monitor use of moneys in child's account when required to ensure continuation of receipt of state and federal benefits for child. Directs department to encourage child who is eligible for services for persons with intellectual or other developmental disabilities to establish account unless department determines doing so is not in child's best interests.].
Title
Relating to savings accounts for foster children.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Maurer [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-09 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | Chapter 471, (2015 Laws): Effective date January 1, 2016. |
2015-06-18 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-06-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-06-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-06-09 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Parrish; Excused, 1--Barton. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Olsen. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Piluso. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Parrish; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 15, 2015 Calendar. |
2015-04-13 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Human Services and Housing. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |