OR HB2881 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 428, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Chapter 428, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces vehicle weight rating with designation as passenger vehicle as qualification for per-mile road usage charge program. Removes cap on number of vehicles that may participate in program. Increases from 17 to 20 miles per gallon minimum rating required for program. Exempts vehicles with rating of 40 miles per gallon or more from additional registration fees. Requires payment of additional registration fees for exempt vehicle if owner ends voluntary participation in program. Changes per-mile road usage charge to five percent of rate of per-gallon gasoline license tax. Provides for reconciliation when amount of fuel taxes paid by person with respect to subject vehicle for reporting period is less than or exceeds per-mile road usage charge owing for such reporting period. Requires Department of Transportation to consult with vehicle dealers to determine how to encourage at point of sale participation in per-mile road usage charge program. Grants department general rulemaking authority for per-mile road usage charge program. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to the per-mile road usage charge program; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lively [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Committee Do pass and rescind subsequent referral to Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Chapter 428, (2019 Laws): effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-06-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2019-06-19 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Bentz. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 4--Girod, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-06-05 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2019-06-04 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 57; Absent, 1--Alonso Leon; Excused, 2--Hernandez, Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-03 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-30 | House | Subsequent referral to Ways and Means rescinded by order of the Speaker. |
2019-05-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. |
2019-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-04 | House | Referred to Transportation with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2019-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |