OR HB2820 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes Prosperity 1,000 Pilot Program to provide career coaching, occupational training and job placement services for at least 1,000 low-income job seekers residing in areas of concentrated poverty. Establishes Prosperity 1,000 Pilot Program to provide career coaching, occupational training and job placement services for at least 1,000 low-income job seekers residing in areas of concentrated poverty. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for biennium beginning July 1, 2021. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to a workforce development pilot program; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-23 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |