OR HB2812 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to amend state mechanical, heating and ventilating code to require use of current best available technology for filtering outside air admitted into buildings and to require that all outside air admitted into buildings passes through filtration technology during periods in which air outside building poses significant risk of harm to health or safety of occupants of building. Requires Director of Department of Consumer and Business Services to amend state mechanical, heating and ventilating code to require use of current best available technology for filtering outside air admitted into buildings and to require that all outside air admitted into buildings passes through filtration technology during periods in which air outside building poses significant risk of harm to health or safety of occupants of building. Specifies standards that code amendment must meet. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to filtration requirements for air admitted into buildings; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Maxine Dexter [D] | Rep. Ken Helm [D] | Rep. Robert Nosse [D] | Rep. Khanh Pham [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Rachel Prusak [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/HB2812 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2812/Introduced |