OR HB2745 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Chapter 425, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Chapter 425, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes certain intergovernmental entities created to operate, maintain, repair and modernize nonrail transportation facilities to impose property taxes in support of those purposes, or issue general obligation bonds supported by property tax revenues, if entity obtains approval of governing bodies of affected cities and counties in entity territory. Permits intergovernmental entity to divide territory of entity into zones in which different tax rates are to be imposed, if different tax rates are based upon qualitative differences in services provided by entity. Requires intergovernmental entity to obtain voter approval of measures authorizing bond issuance, imposing taxes or establishing tax zones within entity territory. Directs entity to establish transit advisory councils, maintain communication with affected local governments and perform specified annual reporting and auditing. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to intergovernmental entity funding of transit operations; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the B-Eng bill (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | House | Chapter 425, (2017 Laws): Effective date October 6, 2017. |
2017-06-22 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 22; nays, 8--Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2017-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Huffman. Passed.Ayes, 51; Nays, 9--Heard, McLane, Nearman, Parrish, Post, Reschke, Stark, Whisnant, Wilson. |
2017-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-05-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2017-03-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Revenue by prior reference. |
2017-03-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-03-01 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy with subsequent referral to Revenue. |
2017-02-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |